EP1607865 - Data control unit capable of correcting boot errors, and corresponding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20864 Agrate Brianza / IT | ||
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | ||
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Babudri, Irene Via Martin Luther King, 10 20040 Burago di Molgora / IT | 02 /
Roveda, Marco Via Ticino, 33/22 20086 Motta Visconti / IT | 03 /
Micheloni, Rino Via Luini, 11 22078 Turate / IT | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2013/33] |
Former [2011/44] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/39] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/51] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al c/o Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425436.5 | 14.06.2004 | [2005/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1607865 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1607865 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
G06F11/1417 (EP,US);
G06F11/076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/35] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datenverwaltungseinheit fähig Startfehler zu korrigieren und entsprechendes Verfahren | [2013/13] | English: | Data control unit capable of correcting boot errors, and corresponding method | [2005/51] | French: | Unité de contrôle de données capable de corriger des erreurs de démarrage et procédé correspondant | [2005/51] |
Former [2005/51] | Datenverwaltungseinheit fähig Bootfehlern zu korrigieren und entsprechendes verfahren | Examination procedure | 15.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2012 | 18.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.08.2013 | [2014/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5832005 (SINGH SHANKER [US]) [X] 1-16 * column A * * column 3, line 31 - line 61 * * column 6, line 15 - line 64 * * column 8, line 25 - line 41 *; | [XA]US5835695 (NOLL MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1,9 * column A; figure 2 * [A] 2-8,10-16; | [A]EP0910020 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE19927058 (ROTH CLEMENS WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]US2002092010 (FISKE ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-16* column A; figure 2 * |