blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1587380

EP1587380 - A METHOD OF MANAGING A SYSTEM FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF TOBACCO PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2015Revocation of patentpublished on 09.12.2015  [2015/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D S.p.A.
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna / IT
[2005/43]
Inventor(s)01 / LI VIGNI, Angelo
Via Romagnoli, 38
I-40137 Bologna / IT
02 / ZANOTTI, Maurizio
Pian di Setta-Torazza 13/D
I-40030 Grizzana Morandi / IT
03 / BERTI, Danilo
Via Cignani, 32
I-40128 Bologna / IT
04 / SANDRI, Eugenio
Via S. Dali, 15
I-43100 Parma / IT
05 / RAVELLI, Paolo
Via Maturi, 6
I-38020 Mezzana / IT
06 / GUIZZARDI, Mara
Via Molino di Sotto, 11
I-44019 S. Agata Bolognese / IT
07 / DRAGHETTI, Fiorenzo
Via San Donino, 506
I-40059 Medicina / IT
 [2005/43]
Representative(s)Bianciardi, Ezio
Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[2011/36]
Former [2005/43]Lanzoni, Luciano
c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date04701640.713.01.2004
[2005/43]
WO2004IB00076
Priority number, dateIT2003BO0001314.01.2003         Original published format: IT BO20030013
[2005/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004062395
Date:29.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1587380
Date:26.10.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1587380
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.07.2004
ClassificationIPC:A24C5/00, B65B19/28
[2005/43]
CPC:
G06Q10/06 (EP,US); A24C5/00 (EP,US); B65B19/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM MANAGEN EINES SYSTEMS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TABAKPRODUKTEN[2005/43]
English:A METHOD OF MANAGING A SYSTEM FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF TOBACCO PRODUCTS[2005/43]
French:METHODE DE GESTION D'UN SYSTEME DESTINE A LA FABRICATION DE PRODUITS DU TABAC[2005/43]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2005National basic fee paid 
12.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/43]
13.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2006Fee for grant paid
29.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.07.2007  03.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG)
Siemensstrasse 10
27283 Verden / DE
Opponent's representative
Bolte, Erich, et al, et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Hollerallee 73
28209 Bremen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/48]
Opponent(s)01  31.07.2007  03.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG)
Siemensstrasse 10
27283 Verden / DE
Opponent's representative
Bolte, Erich, et al, et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73
28209 Bremen / DE
Former [2007/42]
Opponent(s)01  31.07.2007  03.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG)
Siemensstrasse 10
27283 Verden / DE
Opponent's representative
Bolte, Erich, et al, et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Hollerallee 73
D-28209 Bremen / DE
06.09.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.03.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
25.10.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.10.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
02.10.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/50]
Appeal following opposition19.12.2011Appeal received No.  T2585/11
21.02.2012Statement of grounds filed
02.10.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
02.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
CY02.11.2006
CZ02.11.2006
EE02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
RO02.11.2006
SI02.11.2006
SK02.11.2006
TR02.11.2006
LU13.01.2007
IE15.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
BG02.02.2007
DK02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
GR03.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
PT02.04.2007
HU03.05.2007
FR31.01.2013
GB13.01.2015
[2015/48]
Former [2013/50]AT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
CY02.11.2006
CZ02.11.2006
EE02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
RO02.11.2006
SI02.11.2006
SK02.11.2006
TR02.11.2006
LU13.01.2007
IE15.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
BG02.02.2007
DK02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
GR03.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
PT02.04.2007
HU03.05.2007
FR31.01.2013
Former [2009/44]AT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
CY02.11.2006
CZ02.11.2006
EE02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
RO02.11.2006
SI02.11.2006
SK02.11.2006
TR02.11.2006
LU13.01.2007
IE15.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
BG02.02.2007
DK02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
GR03.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
PT02.04.2007
HU03.05.2007
Former [2009/41]AT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
CY02.11.2006
CZ02.11.2006
EE02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
RO02.11.2006
SI02.11.2006
SK02.11.2006
LU13.01.2007
IE15.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
BG02.02.2007
DK02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
GR03.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
PT02.04.2007
HU03.05.2007
Former [2009/10]AT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
CZ02.11.2006
EE02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
RO02.11.2006
SI02.11.2006
SK02.11.2006
IE15.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
BG02.02.2007
DK02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
GR03.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
PT02.04.2007
Former [2008/22]AT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
CZ02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
RO02.11.2006
SI02.11.2006
SK02.11.2006
IE15.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
BG02.02.2007
DK02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
GR03.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
PT02.04.2007
Former [2007/50]AT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
CZ02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
RO02.11.2006
SI02.11.2006
SK02.11.2006
IE15.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
BG02.02.2007
DK02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
PT02.04.2007
Former [2007/47]AT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
CZ02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
RO02.11.2006
SI02.11.2006
SK02.11.2006
BG02.02.2007
DK02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
PT02.04.2007
Former [2007/43]AT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
CZ02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
IT02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
RO02.11.2006
BG02.02.2007
DK02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
PT02.04.2007
Former [2007/30]AT02.11.2006
BE02.11.2006
CH02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
LI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
BG02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
Former [2007/27]AT02.11.2006
FI02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
BG02.02.2007
SE02.02.2007
ES13.02.2007
Former [2007/21]NL02.11.2006
ES13.02.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0016647  (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 10; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP1041006  (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-12 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0045]; figure 6 *;
 [A]US2002094588  (FAN YANG-PING [TW], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.