|
22.12.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.05.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.11.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.07.2010 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.10.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2009 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.04.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
23.01.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2005 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
13.06.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.06.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.06.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.06.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.05.2005 |
Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.05.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.05.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.12.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.12.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.12.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.11.2004 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
25.03.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |