|
12.10.2023 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
33 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.05.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2015 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.06.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
7 |