|
07.11.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
81 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
81 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.02.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.04.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
49 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Communication about possibility to obtain an European search report after lack of unity of the international application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
97 |
|
15.12.2005 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2005 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2005 |
(Partial) description filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2005 |
(Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
118 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
93 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
89 |