EP1602202 - A REAL -TIME SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE ACCURACY OF THE COMPUTED LOCATION OF MOBILE SUBSCRIBERS IN A WIRELESS AD-HOC NETWORK USING A LOW SPEED CENTRAL PROCESSING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meshnetworks, Inc. 485 North Keller Road Maitland, FL 32751 / US | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELCEA, John, M. 2550 Ventura Circle West Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BG / GB | ||
Former [2005/49] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04720364.1 | 12.03.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004US07577 | Priority number, date | US20030453965P | 13.03.2003 Original published format: US 453965 P | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004084022 | Date: | 30.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1602202 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G01S5/0289 (EP,US);
H04W8/08 (KR);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W8/02 (KR);
G01S5/0294 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/21] | H04L12/28, H04Q7/38 | ||
Former IPC [2005/49] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | 30.08.2005 | LT | 30.08.2005 | LV | 30.08.2005 | MK | 30.08.2005 | Title | German: | ECHTZEITSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER GENAUIGKEIT DER BERECHNETEN POSITION MOBILER TEILNEHMER IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN AD-HOC-NETZWERK MIT EINER LANGSAMEN ZENTRALVERARBEITUNGSEINHEIT | [2005/49] | English: | A REAL -TIME SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE ACCURACY OF THE COMPUTED LOCATION OF MOBILE SUBSCRIBERS IN A WIRELESS AD-HOC NETWORK USING A LOW SPEED CENTRAL PROCESSING UNIT | [2005/49] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE EN TEMPS REEL D'AMELIORATION DE LA PRECISION DE L'EMPLACEMENT CALCULE D'ABONNES MOBILES DANS UN RESEAU SANS FIL AD HOC UTILISANT UNE UNITE DE TRAITEMENT CENTRALE A VITESSE LENTE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/06] | 24.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1253438 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0009] - [0018] - [0025] - [0027] - [0040] , [0045] - [0049] - [0054] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A] - JUN-SEOK LIM ET AL, "Forward-backward time varying forgetting factor Kalman Filter based DOA estimation algorithm for UAV (unmanned aerial vehicle) autolanding", 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). ORLANDO, FL, MAY 13 - 17, 2002, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020513), VOL. 4 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-7402-9, pages IV - 3964, XP010804499 [A] 1-10 * section 3. Time-Varying Forgetting Factor in Kalman Based Noise Subspace Estimator * | International search | [A]US6330446 (MORI TAKUYA [JP]); | [A]US6519464 (SANTHOFF JOHN H [US], et al); | [A]US6826126 (WYSSBROD BAPTIST [CH]); | [A] - PATWAI N., "Relative location estimation in Wireless Sensor Network", IEEE TRANSACTION ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (20011108), vol. 51, pages 2137 - 2148, XP002987279 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSP.2003.814469 | by applicant | US5943322 | US2002058502 | US2002080750 | US2002090949 | US6453168 | EP1253438 | US6665333 | US6728545 |