EP1608305 - TRANSPARENT ELECTRONIC MARKING OF A MEDICAMENT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/52] | TRANSPARENT ELECTRONIC MARKING OF A MEDICATION CARTRIDGE | ||
[2008/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTOFFERSEN, Lasse, Wengel Mo̸rkho̸j Bygade 14 So̸borg 2860 / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Preben, Mikael Rolighedsvej 9, 2.tv. Holbæk 4300 / DK | 03 /
BERGGREN, Bo, Erik, Lennart Handskmakaregatan 4 Lund 22736 / SE | [2008/11] |
Former [2005/52] | 01 /
CHRISTOFFERSEN, Lasse, Wengel M rkh j Bygade 14 S borg 2860 / DK | ||
02 /
NIELSEN, Preben, Mikael Rolighedsvej 9, 2.tv. Holb k 4300 / DK | |||
03 /
BERGGREN, Bo, Erik, Lennart Handskmakaregatan 4 Lund 22736 / SE | Application number, filing date | 04722535.4 | 23.03.2004 | [2005/52] | WO2004DK00199 | Priority number, date | DK20030000448 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: DK 200300448 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004084795 | Date: | 07.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1608305 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1608305 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/06, G06K7/06, G06K19/067, G09F3/02 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
G06K1/12 (EP,US);
A61J1/06 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
G06K19/067 (EP,US);
G06K7/065 (EP,US);
G09F3/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTES ELEKTRONISCHES MARKIEREN EINES MEDIKAMENTENBEHÄLTERS | [2008/04] | English: | TRANSPARENT ELECTRONIC MARKING OF A MEDICAMENT CONTAINER | [2008/04] | French: | MARQUAGE ELECTRONIQUE TRANSPARENT DE RÉSERVOIR DE MEDICAMENTS | [2008/04] |
Former [2005/52] | TRANSPARENTE ELEKTRONISCHE MARKIERUNG EINER MEDIKAMENTEN-KARTUSCHE | ||
Former [2005/52] | TRANSPARENT ELECTRONIC MARKING OF A MEDICATION CARTRIDGE | ||
Former [2005/52] | MARQUAGE ELECTRONIQUE TRANSPARENT DE CARTOUCHE DE MEDICAMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2008 | BE | 30.07.2008 | CY | 30.07.2008 | CZ | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | EE | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | IT | 30.07.2008 | NL | 30.07.2008 | PL | 30.07.2008 | RO | 30.07.2008 | SI | 30.07.2008 | SK | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | BG | 30.10.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | ES | 10.11.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | HU | 31.01.2009 | IE | 23.03.2009 | LU | 23.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2013/46] |
Former [2011/43] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CY | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
TR | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
HU | 31.01.2009 | ||
GB | 23.03.2009 | ||
IE | 23.03.2009 | ||
LU | 23.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
HU | 31.01.2009 | ||
GB | 23.03.2009 | ||
IE | 23.03.2009 | ||
LU | 23.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
GB | 23.03.2009 | ||
IE | 23.03.2009 | ||
LU | 23.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
GB | 23.03.2009 | ||
IE | 23.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
GB | 23.03.2009 | ||
IE | 23.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 23.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 30.07.2008 | |
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 30.07.2008 | |
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4179212 (LAHR ROY J [US]) [X] 1,1,1 * column 3, lines 6-62 * * column 5, lines 31-54 * * column 3, lines 6-62 * * column 5, lines 31-54 * * column 3, lines 6-62 * * column 5, lines 31-54 * [A] 23,27,33,23,27,33,23,27,33; | [XA]US4731526 (KNOLL PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,27,1,27,1,27 * column 5, lines 4-21 * * column 5, lines 4-21 * * column 5, lines 4-21 * [A] 23,33,23,33,23,33; | [A]US4739377 (ALLEN JAMES D [US]) [A] 1,23,27,33,1,23,27,33,1,23,27,33 * column 2, lines 45-51 * * column 2, lines 45-51 * * column 2, lines 45-51 *; | [A]EP0690457 (AL COAT LTD [IL]) [A] 1-34,1-34,1-34 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract *; | [A]EP0911859 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [A] 1-34,1-34,1-34 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract *; | [A]WO0211792 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 1-34,1-34,1-34 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A] - "BAR CODE BEARING LABEL FOR CONTAINERS OF BLOOD SAMPLES TAKEN FOR MEDICAL ANALYSIS-HAS TRANSPARENT SHEET ON WHOSE SURFACE BAR CODE IS PROVIDED THAT SHOWS CONTAINER KIND, MANAGEMENT NUMBER", DERWENT, XP002902004 [A] 23-26,23-26,23-26 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * | by applicant | EP0690457 | EP0911859 | US5954700 | WO0042678 | US6265466 | WO0213133 |