blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1730917

EP1730917 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NETWORK INTRUSION DETECTION, RELATED NETWORK AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
III Holdings 1, LLC
2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19808 / US
[2014/48]
Former [2006/50]For all designated states
Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Piazza degli Affari 2
20123 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / MILANI COMPARETTI, Paolo, Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274
10148 Torino / IT
02 / ABENI, Paolo, Telecom Italia S.p.A.
Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274
10148 Torino / IT
 [2006/50]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP, et al
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/40]Zerbi, Guido Maria, et al
Murgitroyd & Company Piazza Borromeo, 12
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2008/16]Battipede, Francesco, et al
Telecom Italia S.p.A. Piazza L. Einaudi, 8
20124 MIlano / IT
Former [2006/50]Giannesi, Pier Giovanni
Pirelli & C. S.p.A., Viale Sarca, 222
20126 Milan / IT
Application number, filing date04724272.230.03.2004
[2006/50]
WO2004EP03350
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005099214
Date:20.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1730917
Date:13.12.2006
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2006/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2005
ClassificationIPC:H04L29/06
[2006/50]
CPC:
H04L63/1408 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES NETZWERKEINDRINGENS, DIESBEZÜGLICHES NETZWERK- UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT[2006/50]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NETWORK INTRUSION DETECTION, RELATED NETWORK AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT[2006/50]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE DETECTION D'INTRUSION DANS UN RESEAU, RESEAU ET PROGICIEL CORRESPONDANTS[2006/50]
Entry into regional phase07.09.2006National basic fee paid 
07.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/50]
11.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
03.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/28]
03.05.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.12.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/28]
Appeal following examination02.07.2013Appeal received No.  T2018/13
22.08.2013Statement of grounds filed
12.12.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
12.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP17206521.1
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2007
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
07.03.2008Request for further processing filed
07.03.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.03.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
07.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
07.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]  - NORTON M ET AL, "The new Snort", COMPUTER SECURITY JOURNAL COMPUT. SECURITY INST USA, (2003), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0277-0865, pages 37 - 47, XP008039475 [X] 1-38 * page 37, column L, paragraph 1 - page 40, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 42, column L, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * * page 43, column R, paragraph L * * page 44, column R, paragraph 4 - page 47, column L, paragraph 3 *
 [X]  - FREISS M ET AL, "EINBRECHERALARM INTRUSION DETECTION MIT SNORT", CT MAGAZIN FUER COMPUTER TECHNIK, VERLAG HEINZ HEISE GMBH., HANNOVER, DE, (20010422), vol. 1, no. 8, ISSN 0724-8679, pages 212 - 219, XP001058695 [X] 1-38 * page 212, column L, paragraph 1 - page 214, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 219, column 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *
 [X]  - FREDERICK K K, "Network Intrusion Detection Signatures, Part 5", ONLINE, (20020416), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://securityfocus.com/infocus/1569, (20041125), XP002307606 [X] 1-38 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - ZHANG Y ET AL, "Detecting Backdoors", (2000), pages 1 - 11, URL: http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/rd/0%2C296649%2C1%2C0.25%2CDownload/http://citeseer.ist.psu.edu/cache/papers/cs/14185/http:zSzzSzwww.aciri.orgzSzvernzSzpaperszSzbackdoor-sec00.pdf/zhang00detecting.pdf, (20041124), XP002307607 [DX] 1,3-5,7-19,21-23,25-36 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.