|
26.11.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
18.11.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.05.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.09.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |