blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1751549

EP1751549 - ORTHODONTIC INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kafaï El-Khorassani, Hossein
11, rue du Kiem
5465 Waldbredimus / LU
[2007/47]
Former [2007/07]For all designated states
Kafa El-Khorassani, Hossein
11, Rue du Kiem
5465 Waldbredimus / LU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/07]
Representative(s)Ocvirk, Philippe
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A.
P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[N/P]
Former [2007/07]Ocvirk, Philippe
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. P.O. Box 48
8001 Strassen / LU
Application number, filing date04734303.321.05.2004
[2007/07]
WO2004IB01653
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005114183
Date:01.12.2005
Language:FR
[2005/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1751549
Date:14.02.2007
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1751549
Date:21.11.2007
Language:FR
[2007/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.12.2005
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/52, C12Q1/40
[2007/07]
CPC:
A61C19/04 (EP); A61C7/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ORTHODONTISCHER INDIKATOR[2007/07]
English:ORTHODONTIC INDICATOR[2007/07]
French:INDICATEUR ORTHODONTIQUE[2007/07]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2006National basic fee paid 
18.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/07]
06.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2007Fee for grant paid
20.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
TR21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
HU22.05.2008
IT31.05.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/38]CY21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
TR21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
HU22.05.2008
Former [2010/34]CY21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
HU22.05.2008
Former [2009/35]CY21.11.2007
CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
EE21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
Former [2009/13]CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
GR22.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
Former [2008/42]CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
PT21.04.2008
Former [2008/39]CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
RO21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
SK21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
Former [2008/35]CZ21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
Former [2008/26]FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
SI21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
Former [2008/24]FI21.11.2007
NL21.11.2007
PL21.11.2007
BG21.02.2008
SE21.02.2008
ES04.03.2008
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4729948  (ARAI KAZUMI ET AL) [X] 1 * abstract * * claim 1 * [A] 2;
 [A]  - SAVAGE M, "A PRELIMINARY REPORT INTO THE DEVELOPMENT AND USE OF SOLUBLE CONTROLLED-RELEASE GLASS TIMING DISCS IMPLANTED INTO ORTHODONTIC APPLIANCES", BRITISH JOURNAL OF ORTHODONTICS, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, EDINBURGH, GB, (1982), vol. 9, ISSN 0301-228X, pages 190 - 193, XP000650241 [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.