|
10.06.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
31 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
30 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
33 |
|
17.09.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
03.09.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2013 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
29.07.2013 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.08.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
15.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
30.06.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
94 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
30 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
4 |