|
15.07.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2008 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Claims filed under Art.19 PCT |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.12.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.10.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |