|
21.09.2017 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.09.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Description |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Description |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
39 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
20 |
|
17.03.2015 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
17 |
|
26.02.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.09.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.09.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.04.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2010 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2010 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
72 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.02.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
47 |