|
25.11.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
21.11.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.11.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
61 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
61 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
13 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
9 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
12.12.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
12.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2007 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
01.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.11.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
16.11.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.06.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.02.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
03.02.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
03.02.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.02.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
03.02.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
13.01.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
23 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |