|
24.02.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.01.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.04.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.09.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2013 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.03.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.07.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
13.08.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |