|
04.02.2015 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
23.05.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.02.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Annex |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
23.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |