|
19.07.2022 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2022 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
60 |
|
27.01.2022 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 14 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
02.11.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2021 |
Reply to a deficiency communication regarding an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2021 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
24.09.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
30.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Declaration for the purpose of the reduction of the fee for appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2021 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 025 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 025 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 026 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
28.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
104 |
|
28.04.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 023 |
Opposition |
24 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
20 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
22.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2021 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.09.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
31 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
31 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
26 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2020 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
66 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2019 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 024 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
48 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
52 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
53 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
360 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
48 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
35 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
46 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
38 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
45 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
46 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
27 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
44 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
28 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
330 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
104 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
56 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 020 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 021 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 024 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2019 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Opposition |
41 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
109 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Priority document |
Opposition |
31 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Communication concerning a request to change bibliographic data after the decision to grant/decision to maintain the patent in a |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.12.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.02.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2018 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.09.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
03.08.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Request for acceleration of appeal proceedings |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.02.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
14.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
26.10.2015 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
21.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2009 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.03.2009 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Communication about possibility to obtain an European search report after lack of unity of the international application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.12.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.08.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.05.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.05.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.05.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.05.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.04.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Invitation to pay additional fees (for internal ISA use) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
29 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |