EP1620119 - USE OF B7-H3 AS AN IMMUNOREGULATORY AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LING, Vincent 18 Forsythe Drive Walpole, MA 02081 / US | 02 /
CARRENO, Beatriz, M. 37 Nash Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 03 /
COLLINS, Mary 54 Rathburn Road Natick, MA 01760 / US | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Tomlinson, Edward James, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Hermann, Bettina Celia, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/05] | Helbig, Christian Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04750222.4 | 16.04.2004 | [2006/05] | WO2004US11767 | Priority number, date | US20030463342P | 17.04.2003 Original published format: US 463342 P | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004093894 | Date: | 04.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1620119 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61P37/00 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
A61K38/4846 (EP,US);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K14/70532 (EP,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/22 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
C12N2501/51 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1774, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/4846, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON B7-H3 ALS IMMUNREGULATORISCHES MITTEL | [2006/05] | English: | USE OF B7-H3 AS AN IMMUNOREGULATORY AGENT | [2006/05] | French: | UTILISATION DE B7-H3 EN TANT QU'AGENT IMMUNOREGULATEUR | [2006/05] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 22.12.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0210187 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al); | [XY]WO03014293 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al); |