|
19.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
241 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.04.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.12.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |