|
25.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.2015 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.12.2015 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
01.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.09.2015 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
64 |
|
28.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.06.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.02.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.10.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
62 |
|
06.08.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
31 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
59 |
|
20.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.07.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2009 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2009 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2006 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2006 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.11.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
16.11.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
16.11.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.11.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.07.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2005 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.07.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.07.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.06.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.06.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
8 |