EP1675464 - WEED CONTROL IN JOINTS OF CONCRETE BLOCK AND OTHER PAVING STONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sønderberg, Frederiksen Jens Brydevej 10 5700 Svendborg / DK | For all designated states Beck, Poul Konrad Søholt Allé 14 8600 Silkeborg / DK | For all designated states Hvorslev, Steffen Birk Svingelvej 8 8840 Rødkærsbro / DK | [2014/23] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Sonderberg, Frederiksen Jens Brydevej 10 5700 Svendborg / DK | ||
For all designated states Beck, Poul Konrad Soholt Allé 14 8600 Silkeborg / DK | |||
For all designated states Hvorslev, Steffen Birk Svingelvej 8 8840 Rodkaersbro / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | ||
Former [2006/27] | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S, Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 04762849.0 | 17.09.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004DK00629 | Priority number, date | DK20030001347 | 17.09.2003 Original published format: DK 200301347 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005025316 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1675464 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1675464 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/00, E01C5/00, E01H11/00, // (A01N59/00, 59:00), A01N25:08 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
E01H11/00 (EP,NO,US);
A01N59/00 (EP,NO,US);
E01C5/003 (EP,NO,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/00, A01N59/00, A01N25/08 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2006/27] | A01N59/00, E01C5/00, E01H11/00, // A01N59/00, A01N59/00, A01N25/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Title | German: | UNKRAUTBEKÄMPFUNG IN BETONSTEINFUGEN UND ANDEREN PFLASTERSTEINEN | [2006/27] | English: | WEED CONTROL IN JOINTS OF CONCRETE BLOCK AND OTHER PAVING STONE | [2006/27] | French: | DESHERBAGE DES JOINTS DE BLOC DE BETON ET AUTRE TYPE DE PAVE | [2006/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 23.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Gebrüder Dorfner GmbH & Co. Kaolin- und Kristallquarzsand-Werke KG Scharhof 1 92242 Hirschau / DE Opponent's representative Hannke, Christian, et al, et al Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Straße 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Gebrüder Dorfner GmbH & Co. Kaolin- und Kristallquarzsand-Werke KG Scharhof 1 92242 Hirschau / DE Opponent's representative Hannke, Christian, et al, et al Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | 14.04.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.10.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.12.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.02.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/16] | Appeal following opposition | 13.02.2017 | Appeal received No. T0403/17 | 24.04.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.02.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 23.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2004 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IT | 17.09.2014 | LU | 17.09.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.09.2004 | |
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 17.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06272203 ; | [XY]WO03037817 (LIDDY JOHN THOMAS [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,1-9,11,12,1-9,11,12 * page 1, line 11 - line 20 * * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 22 - line 31 * * page 5, line 13 - line 25 * * page 1, line 11 - line 20 * * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 22 - line 31 * * page 5, line 13 - line 25 * * page 1, line 11 - line 20 * * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 4, line 22 - line 31 * * page 5, line 13 - line 25 * [Y] 1-16,1-16,1-16; | [XY]JPH06245680 ; | [Y]US3591360 (VAHLSING FREDERICK H JR) [Y] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [X]JPH05123063 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941222), vol. 0186, no. 83, Database accession no. (M - 1730), & JP06272203 A 19940927 (CENTRAL GLASS) [X] 1-16,1-16,1-16 * column A * * column A * * column A * | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 40, Database accession no. 1994-321203, XP002314483 & JPH06245680 A 19940906 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,9,11,16,1,9,11,16,1,9,11,16 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * [Y] 1-16,1-16,1-16 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 25, Database accession no. 1993-199658, XP002314484 & JPH05123063 A 19930521 (YAMAKAWA SANGYO KK) [X] 1,9,13,16,1,9,13,16,1,9,13,16 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * | by applicant | CA2299301 | JPH06272203 | WO03037817 | JPH06245680 | US3591360 | - B- SHACKEL, "Design and construction of interlocking concrete block pavement", SCHOOL OF CIVIL ENGINEERING, UNIVERSITY OF NEW SOUTH WALES |