|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2010 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the International Representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.09.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2006 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.07.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.07.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.06.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.06.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.06.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.08.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |