|
02.02.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.09.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.08.2006 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.02.2006 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |