EP1655765 - EXPOSURE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/19] | EXPOSURE METHOD AND EXPOSURE APPARATUS, STAGE UNIT, AND DEVICE MANUFACTURING METHOD | ||
[2008/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION Fuji Building 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8831 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION Fuji Building, 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8831 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBAZAKI, Yuichi, c/o NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Maruunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008331 / JP | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Gill, David Alan W.P. Thompson & Co., 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04771271.6 | 05.08.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004JP11244 | Priority number, date | JP20030288919 | 07.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003288919 | [2006/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005015615 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655765 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655765 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027, G03F7/20 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
G03F7/70716 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/2004 (KR);
G03F7/70733 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/7085 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2008/48] | English: | EXPOSURE METHOD | [2008/48] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXPOSITION | [2008/48] |
Former [2006/19] | BELICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND BELICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BÜHNENEINHEIT UND BAUELEMENTE-HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2006/19] | EXPOSURE METHOD AND EXPOSURE APPARATUS, STAGE UNIT, AND DEVICE MANUFACTURING METHOD | ||
Former [2006/19] | PROCEDE D'EXPOSITION ET APPAREIL D'EXPOSITION, UNITE DE PLATEAU ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2006 | Translation filed | 24.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08163444.6 / EP1995769 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2009 | BE | 15.04.2009 | CY | 15.04.2009 | CZ | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | EE | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | IT | 15.04.2009 | PL | 15.04.2009 | RO | 15.04.2009 | SI | 15.04.2009 | SK | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | BG | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | ES | 26.07.2009 | GB | 05.08.2009 | IE | 05.08.2009 | LU | 05.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | FR | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | HU | 16.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
GB | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LU | 05.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
HU | 16.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
GB | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LU | 05.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IT | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
GB | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
GB | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 26.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0696762 (ORC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,8,16,17,20 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0001] ** paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0085] *; | [X]EP0722123 (ORC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0123] * | International search | [X]JPS5853831 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]JPH01314247 (FUJI PLANT KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH11191585 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2003017404 (NIKON CORP) |