|
17.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
08.10.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2019 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.07.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
24 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.03.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
39 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.10.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.03.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
42 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
80 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
14 |