|
08.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
23.01.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2017 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.05.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
08.06.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2005 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
30 |