EP1648914 - OLIGOMERIC COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN MODULATION OF SMALL NON-CODING RNAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regulus Therapeutics Inc. 10614 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Regulus Therapeutics, Inc 1896 Rutherford Road Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Regulus Therapeutics, LLC 1896 Rutherford Road Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 1896 Rutherford Road Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESAU, Christine 8726 Villa La Jolla Dr. 79 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
LOLLO, Bridget 2132 Pleasant Grove Road Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 03 /
BENNETT, C., Frank 1347 Cassins Street Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 04 /
FREIER, Susan, M. 2946 Renault Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 05 /
GRIFFEY, Richard, H. 360 Barsby Street Vista, CA 92084 / US | 06 /
BAKER, Brenda, F. 2927 Ranchos Cortes Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 07 /
VICKERS, Timothy 3326 Golfers Drive Oceanside, CA 92056 / US | 08 /
MARCUSSON, Eric, G. 260 King Street 727 San Fransisco California 94017 / US | 09 /
KOLLER, Erich 2622 Lewis Lane Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 10 /
SWAYZE, Eric, E. 7789 Palenque Street Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 11 /
JAIN, Ravi 37896 Abraham Street Fremont, CA 94536 / US | 12 /
BHAT, Balkrishen 911 Rosemary Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 13 /
PERALTA, Eigen 810 Calle Lagasca Chula Vista, CA 91910 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
ESAU, Christine 8726 Villa La Jolla Dr. 79 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | ||
02 /
LOLLO, Bridget 2132 Pleasant Grove Road Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | |||
03 /
BENNETT, C., Frank 1347 Cassins Street Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
04 /
FREIER, Susan, M. 2946 Renault Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
05 /
GRIFFEY, Richard, H. 360 Barsby Street Vista, CA 92084 / US | |||
06 /
BAKER, Brenda, F. 2927 Ranchos Cortes Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
07 /
VICKERS, Timothy 3326 Golfers Drive Oceanside, CA 92056 / US | |||
08 /
MARCUSSON, Eric, G. 260 King Street 727 San Fransisco California 94017 / US | |||
09 /
KOLLER, Erich 2622 Lewis Lane Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
10 /
SWAYZE, Eric, E. 7789 Palenque Street Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
11 /
JAIN, Ravi 306 Chinquapin Avenue 2 Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | |||
12 /
BHAT, Balkrishen 911 Rosemary Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
13 /
PERALTA, Eigen 810 Calle Lagasca Chula Vista, CA 91910 / US | Representative(s) | Chapman, Desmond Mark, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/17] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04780181.6 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004US25300 | Priority number, date | US20030492056P | 31.07.2003 Original published format: US 492056 P | US20030516303P | 31.10.2003 Original published format: US 516303 P | US20030531596P | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 531596 P | US20040562417P | 14.04.2004 Original published format: US 562417 P | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005013901 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1648914 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, A61K48/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (US);
C12N2310/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/141 (US);
C12N2310/31 (US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/317 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3181 (EP,US);
C12N2310/32 (US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3231 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/341 (EP,US);
C12N2310/346 (EP,US);
C12N2310/351 (US);
C12N2310/3515 (US);
C12N2320/11 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OLIGOMERE VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER MODULIERUNG VON KLEINEN NICHT-KODIENDEREN RNAS | [2006/17] | English: | OLIGOMERIC COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN MODULATION OF SMALL NON-CODING RNAS | [2006/17] | French: | COMPOSES OLIGOMERES ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISABLES POUR MODULER DES PETITS ARN NON-CODANTS | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2013 | Observations by third parties | 25.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 16.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/41] | Divisional application(s) | EP12173039.4 / EP2530157 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 09.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - LAGOS-QUINTANA M ET AL, "Identification of Tissue-Specific MicroRNAs from Mouse", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (20020430), vol. 12, no. 9, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 735 - 739, XP026073748 [A] 1-14,23-26,29-30,34,48-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(02)00809-6 | [A] - ALTMANN K-H ET AL, NOVEL CHEMISTRY, APPLIED ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDE TECHNOLOGY, WILEY-LISS, CHICHESTER, GB, PAGE(S) 73 - 107, (19980101), ISBN 9780471172796, XP002119324 [A] 1-13 | [AD] - LIN K-Y ET AL, "A cytosine analogue capable of clamp-like binding to a guanine in helical nucleic acids", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19980826), vol. 120, no. 33, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 8531 - 8532, XP002994711 [AD] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja981286z | [T] - CHANG JINHONG ET AL, "miR-122, a mammalian liver-specific microRNA, is processed from hcr mRNA and may downregulate the high affinity cationic amino acid transporter CAT-1", RNA BIOLOGY, (20040701), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 106 - 113, XP002544785 | International search | [X]WO03029459 (MAX PLANCK GES ZUR [DE], et al) | other | WO03029459 | WO2005107816 | EP1931782 | - BOUTLA A. ET AL, "Developmental defects by antisense-mediated inactivation of micr-RNAs 2 and 13 in Drosophila and the identification of putative target genes", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 31, no. 17, pages 4973 - 4980, XP002993014 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkg707 | - MEISTER G. ET AL, "Sequence-specific inhibition of microRNA- and siRNA-induced RNA silencing", RNA, (2004), vol. 10, pages 544 - 550, XP002376645 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1261/rna.5235104 | - ESAU C. ET AL, KEYSTONE SYMPOSIUM "SIRNAS AND MIRNAS", (20040414), page 117 (ABSTRACT), XP003031911 | - CHANG J. ET AL, "miR-122, a mammalian liver-specific microRNA, is processed from hcr mRNA and may downregulate the high affinity cationic amino acid transporter CAT-1", RNA BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 106 - 113, XP002591841 |