|
01.10.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
20.09.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2013 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.03.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2009 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2006 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
102 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
86 |