|
17.04.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.03.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2014 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2014 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2014 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.10.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.12.2010 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
32 |
|
08.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
11.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
11.06.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2007 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2006 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |