|
15.04.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
30.03.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.09.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.03.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
42 |
|
21.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
23 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Subsequently filed documents not duly signed |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.11.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.11.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.11.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
01.11.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |