blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1670632

EP1670632 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR FRICTION WELDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Opposition rejectedpublished on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KLN ULTRASCHALL AG
Siegfriedstrasse 124
64646 Heppenheim / DE
[2010/27]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
KLN ULTRASCHALL GMBH
Siegfriedstrasse 124
D-64646 Heppenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MICHEL, Werner
Greinstrasse 10a
64291 Darmstadt / DE
02 / ECKERT, Siegfried
Schulstrasse 2
64668 Rimbach / DE
03 / WAGNER, Reinhard
Zwengerstrasse 2
64646 Heppenheim / DE
 [2006/25]
Representative(s)Habermann Intellectual Property Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB
Dolivostraße 15A
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/16]Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte
Dolivostrasse 15A
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2006/25]Gornott, Dietmar
Zilleweg 29
64291 Darmstadt / DE
Application number, filing date04789958.811.10.2004
[2006/25]
WO2004DE02252
Priority number, dateDE2003104734511.10.2003         Original published format: DE 10347345
[2006/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005035227
Date:21.04.2005
Language:DE
[2005/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1670632
Date:21.06.2006
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2006/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1670632
Date:05.05.2010
Language:DE
[2010/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.04.2005
ClassificationIPC:B29C65/06, B23K20/10, B23K20/12
[2006/25]
CPC:
B23K20/10 (EP,KR,US); B23K20/12 (KR); B23K20/121 (EP,US);
B29C65/06 (KR); B29C65/0618 (EP,US); B29C66/9515 (EP,US);
B29C66/9516 (EP,US); B29C66/8322 (EP,US); B29C66/9513 (EP,US);
B29C66/9592 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM REIBUNGSSCHWEISSEN[2006/25]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR FRICTION WELDING[2006/25]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE PAR FICTION[2006/25]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2005National basic fee paid 
31.08.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/25]
31.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2010Fee for grant paid
22.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.02.2011  28.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Branson Ultraschall, Niederlassung der EMERSON Technologies GmbH & Co. OHG
Waldstr. 53-55
63128 Dietzenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
HWP Intellectual Property
Ridlerstraße 35
80339 München / DE
 [2015/36]
Former [2011/11]
Opponent(s)01  07.02.2011   
BRANSON ULTRASCHALL Niederlassung der EMERSON TECHNOLOGIES GmbH und Co
Waldstraße 53-55
63128 Dietzenbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bockhorni & Kollegen
Elsenheimerstraße 49
80687 München / DE
04.04.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.07.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.04.2012Date of oral proceedings
27.06.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.06.2012Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
30.09.2016Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/51]
Appeal following opposition27.08.2012Appeal received No.  T1892/12
12.10.2012Statement of grounds filed
30.09.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
30.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
AT11.10.2010
GB11.10.2010
LU11.10.2010
BE31.10.2010
CH31.10.2010
LI31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
HU06.11.2010
[2013/42]
Former [2011/24]CY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2011/11]CY05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
Former [2011/09]CY05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
Former [2011/07]CY05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
Former [2011/05]CY05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
Former [2011/04]FI05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
Former [2011/01]FI05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
GR06.08.2010
Former [2010/51]FI05.05.2010
NL05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
Former [2010/45]NL05.05.2010
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0481125  (BRANSON ULTRASCHALL [DE]) [AD] 1,4* abstract *;
 [XA]US2002017883  (MARCINKIEWICZ JOSEPH G [US], et al) [X] 1,4-12 * figures 2,9,12B * * paragraphs [0046] , [0048] , [0051] , [0059] , [0087] , [0121] , [0142] , [0125] , [0128] , [0149] * [A] 2,3;
 [X]WO02076737  (FORWARD TECHNOLOGY IND INC [US]) [X] 1,4-6,10,12 * page 10, lines 5-7 * * page 10, lines 16-18 * * figures 5,6 * * page 6, lines 5-8 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.