|
02.11.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.07.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
35 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Description |
Opposition |
33 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2016 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
21.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2015 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.06.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.06.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.11.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
63 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.07.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
57 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2008 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.07.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
119 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
95 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
21 |