|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2013 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2012 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.02.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.02.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.01.2011 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.11.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.05.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
23 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |