EP1692682 - A DISPLAY APPARATUS WITH A DISPLAY DEVICE AND A CYCLIC RAIL-STABILIZED METHOD OF DRIVING THE DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states E Ink Corporation 733 Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138-1002 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states E Ink Corporation 733 Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138-1002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Guofu c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KNAIAN, Ara c/o 733 Concord Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138-1002 / US | 03 /
AMUNDSON, Karl, R. c/o 733 Concord Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138-1002 / US | 04 /
HENZEN, Alexander, V. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
VAN DE KAMER, Johannes, P. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
ZEHNER, Robert, W. c/o 733 Concord Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138-1002 / US | 07 /
ZION, Benjamin, D. c/o 733 Concord Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138-1002 / US | 08 /
AILENEI, Neculai c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Bekkers, Joost J.J, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/34] | Rolfes, Johannes Gerardus Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04799214.4 | 23.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004IB52512 | Priority number, date | EP20030104355 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: EP 03104355 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005052905 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692682 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
G09G3/344 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/2011 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/2014 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/061 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/068 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/0204 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DISPLAY-VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER DISPLAY-EINRICHTUNG UND ZYKLISCHES RAIL-STABILISIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG DER DISPLAY-EINRICHTUNG | [2006/34] | English: | A DISPLAY APPARATUS WITH A DISPLAY DEVICE AND A CYCLIC RAIL-STABILIZED METHOD OF DRIVING THE DISPLAY DEVICE | [2006/34] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE EQUIPE D'UN DISPOSITIF AFFICHAGE ET PROCEDE CYCLIQUE A STABILISATION PAR RAPPORT AUX BARRES, DESTINE AU PILOTAGE DU DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003137521 (ZEHNER ROBERT W [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002196207 (MACHIDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03079323 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03050606 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-12 * the whole document *; | [YP]EP1462847 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [YP] 1-12 * the whole document * |