|
03.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.01.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
27.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
53 |
|
13.08.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
100 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
25 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
41 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.04.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |