|
10.09.2018 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2016 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2016 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
35 |
|
06.07.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.06.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.04.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.04.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.03.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.04.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.04.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
19.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.04.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.11.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2006 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2006 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2006 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
45 |