Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1694438

EP1694438 - CATALYST EXTRUDATES BASED ON COPPER OXIDE AND THEIR USE FOR HYDROGENATING CARBONYL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2016Revocation of patentpublished on 12.10.2016  [2016/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/10]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2006/35]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHLITTER, Stephan
Mainstr. 2
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
02 / SCHUBERT, Olga
Alwin-Mittasch-Platz 11
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
03 / HESSE, Michael
Weinbietstr.10
67549 Worms / DE
04 / BORCHERS, Sabine
Hauptstrasse 32
76872 Erlenbach bei Kandel / DE
05 / RÖSCH, Markus
Sours-Allee 13
55276 Dienheim / DE
06 / PINKOS, Rolf
Birkental 3a
67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE
07 / WECK, Alexander
Buttstädter Str. 9
67251 Freinsheim / DE
08 / WINDECKER, Gunther
Von-Sturmfeder-Strasse 7
67067 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [2010/22]
Former [2006/35]01 / SCHLITTER, Stephan
Mainstr. 2
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
02 / SCHUBERT, Olga
Alwin Mittasch Platz 11
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
03 / HESSE, Michael
Weinbietstr.10
67549 Worms / DE
04 / BORCHERS, Sabine
Hauptstrasse 32
76872 Erlenbach bei Kandel / DE
05 / RÖSCH, Markus
Sours-Allee 13
55276 Dienheim / DE
06 / PINKOS, Rolf
Birkental 3a
67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE
07 / WECK, Alexander
Buttstädter Str. 9
67251 Freinsheim / DE
08 / WINDECKER, Gunther
Von-Sturmfeder-Strasse 7
67067 Ludwigshafen / DE
Representative(s)Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Im Zollhof 1
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/46]Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
Application number, filing date04803522.404.12.2004
[2006/35]
WO2004EP13809
Priority number, dateDE200315771709.12.2003         Original published format: DE 10357717
[2006/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005058491
Date:30.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1694438
Date:30.08.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005
[2006/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1694438
Date:24.11.2010
Language:DE
[2010/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/72, B01J37/00, C07D307/08, C07D315/00, C07C29/136
[2006/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATALYSATOREXTRUDATE AUF BASIS KUPFEROXID UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR HYDRIERUNG VON CARBONYLVERBINDUNGEN[2006/35]
English:CATALYST EXTRUDATES BASED ON COPPER OXIDE AND THEIR USE FOR HYDROGENATING CARBONYL COMPOUNDS[2006/35]
French:PRODUIT D'EXTRUSION POUR CATALYSEUR A BASE D'OXYDE DE CUIVRE ET SON UTILISATION DANS L'HYDROGENATION DE COMPOSES CARBONYLE[2006/35]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2006National basic fee paid 
10.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/35]
12.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2010Fee for grant paid
16.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.08.2011  05.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1
65843 Sulzbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Dannenberger, Oliver Andre
Abitz & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
 02  24.08.2011  05.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
Opponent's representative
Gibson, Sara Hillary Margaret
Intellectual Property Department
Johnson Matthey Catalysts
Balasis Avenue
P.O. Box 1
GB-Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2012/50]
Opponent(s)01  24.08.2011  05.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1
65843 Sulzbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Dannenberger, Oliver Andre
Abitz & Partner Hörselbergstrasse 5
81677 Munich / DE
 02  24.08.2011  05.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
Opponent's representative
Gibson, Sara Hillary Margaret
Intellectual Property Department
Johnson Matthey Catalysts
Balasis Avenue
P.O. Box 1
GB-Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB
Former [2011/39]
Opponent(s)01  24.08.2011   
SÜD-CHEMIE AG
Lenbachplatz 6
D-80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Dannenberger, Oliver Andre
Abitz & Partner Hörselbergstrasse 5
81677 Munich / DE
 02  24.08.2011   
Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company
5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street
London EC4A 4AB / GB
Opponent's representative
Gibson, Sara Hillary Margaret
Intellectual Property Department
Johnson Matthey Catalysts
Balasis Avenue
P.O. Box 1
GB-Billingham, Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB
17.10.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
26.11.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.11.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.12.2013Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/41]
Appeal following opposition31.01.2014Appeal received No.  T0355/14
28.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
14.07.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
14.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.07.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
TR24.11.2010
AT04.12.2010
LU04.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
HU25.05.2011
[2015/21]
Former [2011/38]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
RO24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
MC31.12.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/36]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
DK24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
PL24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
SK24.11.2010
MC31.12.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/35]CY24.11.2010
CZ24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
IE24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
MC31.12.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/32]CY24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
SI24.11.2010
BG24.02.2011
GR25.02.2011
ES07.03.2011
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/24]CY24.11.2010
FI24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
SE24.11.2010
IS24.03.2011
PT24.03.2011
Former [2011/23]FI24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
IS24.03.2011
Former [2011/19]LT24.11.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1228803  (BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-10 * * example 1 *;
 [X]US4423155  (BELL ET AL) [X] 1-10 * examples 1,3-6 * * column 4, line 33 - line 43 *;
 [X]DE2332906  (KAO SOAP CO., LTD., TOKIO) [X] 1-3,7-11 * the whole document *;
 [DX]WO9734694  (MALLINCKRODT CHEMICAL, INC; CHEN, JIANPING) [DX] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4666879  (KELLY ET AL)
by applicantWO9734694