EP1703885 - SECURITY ELEMENT FOR ANTIFALSIFICATION PAPERS AND VALUABLE DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Michael Rossfeldweg 9 82216 Maisach / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Johann Zugspitzstrasse 17 85586 Poing / DE | 03 /
SCHIFFMANN, Peter Angerstrasse 12a 85354 Freising / DE | 04 /
SCHMID, Monika, Brigitte Franz-Metzner-Strasse 11 80937 München / DE | [2013/48] |
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
BAUER, Michael Rossfeldweg 9 82216 Maisach/Obb. / DE | ||
02 /
MÜLLER, Johann Zugspitzstrasse 17 85586 Poing / DE | |||
03 /
SCHIFFMANN, Peter Angerstrasse 12a 85354 Freising / DE | |||
04 /
SCHMID, Monika, Brigitte Franz-Metzner-Strasse 11 80937 München / DE | Representative(s) | Zeuner Summerer Stütz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Nußbaumstraße 8 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Zeuner Summerer Stütz Nußbaumstrasse 8 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Zeuner & Summerer Patentanwälte, Partnerschaft Hedwigstraße 9 D-80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04803864.0 | 14.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004EP14242 | Priority number, date | DE20031061131 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10361131 | [2006/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005062692 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1703885 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703885 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
B41M3/14 (EP);
B42D25/23 (US);
B41M3/144 (EP);
B42D25/00 (EP);
B42D25/36 (EP);
B42D25/369 (EP,US);
B42D25/378 (US);
B42D2035/06 (EP);
B42D2035/50 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT FÜR SICHERHEITSPAPIERE UND WERTDOKUMENTE | [2006/39] | English: | SECURITY ELEMENT FOR ANTIFALSIFICATION PAPERS AND VALUABLE DOCUMENTS | [2006/39] | French: | ELEMENT DE SECURITE POUR PAPIERS DE SECURITE ET DOCUMENTS DE VALEUR | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2004 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | AT | 14.12.2014 | IE | 14.12.2014 | LU | 14.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0303725 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-13,20-22 * column 2, lines 5-15 * * column 4, lines 14-24 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 7 * * column 5, lines 27-55 *; | [A]EP0318717 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [A] 1-5,7-13,20-22 * page 6, lines 1-14 *; | [X]DE3906695 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-13,20-22 * column 6, lines 34-46 * * column 9, lines 18-23 * * claim 6 *; | [A]US5267755 (YAMAUCHI MINEO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,7-13,20-22* claim 1 *; | [X]EP0657297 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,20-22 * page 7, lines 21-26 *; | [A]DE19631887 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,7-13,20-22 * column 3, lines 60-64 *; | [A]EP0967091 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [A] 1-5,7-13,20-22 * paragraph [0012] *; | [A]DE19910158 (WHD ELEKTRON PRUEFTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 5,13 * column 2, lines 19-41 * | Examination | DE69318402T | EP1038690 | EP1291194 | FR2858582 |