|
15.01.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
26 |
|
22.02.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.02.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2013 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.02.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
31.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
14.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.01.2013 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
48 |
|
04.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.12.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
39 |
|
06.10.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
42 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
13 |
|
18.09.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.05.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
25.11.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.11.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
23.09.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.09.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2011 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.2011 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2011 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.05.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
02.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.11.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
26 |
|
29.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
64 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
64 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.12.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
145 |
|
25.09.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
02.06.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2007 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2007 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |