EP1717624 - ZOOM LENS AND IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURODA, Daisuke c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35-Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
IWASAWA, Yoshito c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Leppard, Andrew John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Leppard, Andrew John D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04808127.7 | 24.12.2004 | [2006/44] | WO2004JP19777 | Priority number, date | JP20040019964 | 28.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004019964 | [2006/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005073774 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717624 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/173 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
G02B13/0065 (EP,US);
G02B15/145121 (EP,KR,US);
G02B13/009 (EP,KR,US);
G02B15/173 (EP,US);
G02B3/0087 (KR);
G03B17/12 (KR);
H04N23/55 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/44] | G02B15/16, G02B15/20, G02B13/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/18] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZOOM-LINSE UND ABBILDUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2006/44] | English: | ZOOM LENS AND IMAGING DEVICE | [2006/44] | French: | OBJECTIF ZOOM ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D IMAGES sb /sb | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2005 | Translation filed | 28.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11133303 (CANON KK) [Y] 1* page 7, paragraph 85; table 1 *; | [XY]JP2003329930 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0064]; figures 1,2(a)-2(c); table 1 * [Y] 1 | International search | [Y]JPH11101941 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH11133303 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2000131610 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2003202500 (MINOLTA CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003302576 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JP2003329930 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) |