EP1687275 - PYRIDIN-4-YLAMINE COMPOUNDS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF NEUROPATHIC PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Jongwon 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
BOUERES, Julia, K. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
MUNOZ, Benito 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
PRACITTO, Richard 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
STOCK, Nicholas 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
VENKATRAMAN, Shankar 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2006/32] | Man, Jocelyn, et al Merck & Co.,Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04811391.4 | 18.11.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004US38669 | Priority number, date | US20030524734P | 21.11.2003 Original published format: US 524734 P | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005051915 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687275 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/00, C07D219/00, A61K31/435, A61K31/47, A61P25/00 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
C07D219/12 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D215/46 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/32] | C07D215/00, C07D219/00, A61K31/435, A61K31/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | 21.06.2006 | LV | 21.06.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEUROPATHISCHEN SCHMERZEN GEEIGNETE PYRIDIN-4-YLAMINVERBINDUNGEN | [2006/32] | English: | PYRIDIN-4-YLAMINE COMPOUNDS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF NEUROPATHIC PAIN | [2006/32] | French: | COMPOSES DE PYRIDIN-4-YLAMINE CONVENANT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR NEUROPATHIQUE | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 27.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2077249 (FRITZ MIETZSCH, et al) [X] 1-9 * column W *; | [X]EP0446604 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [X] 1-9 * example 116; claim - *; | [X]WO9639818 (CERUS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * example 17; claim 11; table 23 *; | [X]WO9721681 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]WO0032175 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 20 - page 21; claims 1,24 *; | [X]WO0117529 (UNITECH PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 1 - page 5; figure 1; claim - *; | [X] - RA J S ET AL, "SYNTHESIS, PHARMACOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES & PHYSICO-CHEMICAL PROPERTIESOF 4-(SUBSTITUTED AMINO/N4-ARYLPIPERAZINYL/AMINOCARBONYL)-2,3- POLYMETHYLENEQUINOLINES", AN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, JODHPUR, IN, (19870401), vol. 26B, no. 4, pages 318 - 329, XP000560899 [X] 1-5,9-11 * table 1 * | [X] - STEINBERG G M ET AL, "A HYDROPHOBIC BINDING SITE IN ACETYLCHOLINESTERASE", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, (19751101), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1056 - 1061, XP000651125 [X] 1-5,9,11 * page 1056 - page 1058; compound 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00245a002 | [X] - APELT J ET AL, "Development of a new class of nonimidazole histamine H(3) receptor ligands with combined inhibitory histamine N-methyltransferase activity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, (20020228), vol. 45, no. 5, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1128 - 1141, XP002280989 [X] 1-12 * page 1128 - page 1137 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0110845 | [X] - WOYNAROWSKI J M ET AL, "INDUCTION OF DNA-PROTEIN CROSSLINKS BY ANTITUMOR 1-NITRO-9AMINOACRIDINES IN L1210 LEUKEMIA CELLS", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (19890901), vol. 38, no. 22, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 4095 - 4101, XP001094428 [X] 1-5,11 * page 4095; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(89)90691-6 | [X] - C. HELLER, "prevention of the emergence of drug resistance in bacteria by acridines", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, usa, (1966), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 879 - 885, XP002506805 [X] 1-5,11 * page 879 - page 882 * | [X] - E. SHEPARD, "nuclear substituted 9-(4'diethylamino-1'-methylbutylamino)-acridines.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., USAMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., (1948), vol. 70, no. 5, pages 1979 - 1980, XP002506806 [X] 1-5,11 * page 1979 - page 1980 * | [X] - L. SARGENT ET AL., "attempts to find new antimalarials.XIV.studies in the acridine series II.dialkylaminoalkylamines dervied from 9-chloro-1,2,3,4-tetrahydroacridine.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY., USAMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON., (1946), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 359 - 362, XP002506807 [X] 1-9,11 * page 359 - page 362 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01174a009 | International search | [X]US3066141 (JONES JR RALPH, et al); | [X]US5021426 (BALDWIN JOHN J [US], et al); | [X]EP0512890 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) | [X] - LAWS G.M., "mutation research", (2001), vol. 484, pages 3 - 18 |