|
02.05.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
30.03.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.02.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2017 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
13.10.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2016 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
05.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2013 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2013 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2012 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2010 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |