EP1839154 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF ERASING NON-VOLATILE RECORDING MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teac Aerospace Technologies, Inc. 1724 Gage Road Montebello CA 90640 / US | For all designated states Jensen, Peter 1724 Gage Road Montebello CA 90640 / US | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Peter Teac Aerospace Technologies 1724 Gage Road Montebello, California 90640 / US | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 04813277.3 | 06.12.2004 | [2007/40] | WO2004US40940 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006062511 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1839154 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F12/00, G11C16/16, G11B5/024 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/0652 (EP);
G06F21/6209 (EP);
G06F3/0623 (EP);
G06F3/0676 (EP);
G06F2221/2143 (EP);
G11C16/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/40] | G06F12/00, G11B5/024, G11C16/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM LÖSCHEN VON NICHTFLÜCHTIGEN AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIEN | [2007/40] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF ERASING NON-VOLATILE RECORDING MEDIA | [2007/40] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'EFFACEMENT DE SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT NON VOLATIL | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5530828 (KAKI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,17,20,21,25 * the whole document *; | [A]US6338114 (PAULSEN MICHAEL ALOYSIUS [US], et al) [A] 1,17,20,21,25 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 13 * * figure 1 * * column 7, lines 13-41 * * figure 5 *; | [X]US2002181134 (BUNKER KEITH G [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] * * figures 3A,3B,3C *; | [X]US6658438 (MOORE CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * column 1, lines 62-65 * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 5 * * figure 2 * * column 3, lines 6-24 * * figures 3a,3b,3c *; | [A]US6748482 (FACKENTHAL RICHARD E [US]) [A] 1,17,20,21,25 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 19 * * figure 2 * * figure 5 *; | [A] - GUTMANN P, "Secure Deletion of Data from Magnetic and Solid-State Memory", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX SECURITY SYMPOSIUM, XX, XX, (19960722), page 14COMPLETE, XP002190890 [A] 1,17,20,21,25 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6034882 (JOHNSON MARK G [US], et al); | [A]US6212600 (FRIEDMAN GEORGE [US], et al); | [A]US2001025343 (CHRISOP ROY [US], et al); | [X]US6507911 (LANGFORD GLENN C [CA]); | [A]US2003088745 (OKADA KEISUKE [JP]); | [A]US2003103288 (SUZUKI NOBORU [JP]); | [A]US2003110411 (HARARI ELIYAHOU [US], et al); | [X]US2003196036 (GIBBLE KEVIN L [US], et al); | [X]US6658438 (MOORE CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al); | [A]US6731447 (BUNKER KEITH G [US], et al); | [A]US6748482 (FACKENTHAL RICHARD E [US]); | [A]US2004221102 (WATANABE NAOKI [JP]); | [X]US2004268073 (MORISAWA TOSHIKAZU [JP]); | [A] - GUTMANN P., "Secure Deletion of Data from Magnetic and Solid-State Memory", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH USENIX SECURITY SYMPOSIUM, pages 77 - 90, XP002190890 |