EP1682836 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING CARBON MONOXIDE BY CRYOGENIC DISTILLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide S. A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUROUX, Danièle Villa Clarmont 13 rue J. Marie Brugnot 94450 Limeil-Brevannes / FR | [2012/52] |
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
FAUROUX, Danièle Villa Clarmont, 13 rue J. Marie Brugnot F-94450 Limeil-Brevannes / FR | Representative(s) | Mercey, Fiona Susan L'Air Liquide SA Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Mercey, Fiona Susan L'Air Liquide SA, Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2006/30] | Mercey, Fiona Susan L'Air Liquide SA, Département Propriété Intellectuelle, 75 quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04817099.7 | 21.09.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004FR50446 | Priority number, date | FR20030050621 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: FR 0350621 | [2006/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005033599 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682836 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682836 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/02, C01B31/18, C01B3/50 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
F25J3/0261 (EP,US);
C01B32/40 (EP,US);
F25J3/0223 (EP,US);
F25J3/0233 (EP,US);
F25J3/0252 (EP,US);
F25J2200/70 (EP,US);
F25J2200/74 (EP,US);
F25J2200/94 (EP,US);
F25J2205/04 (EP,US);
F25J2215/04 (EP,US);
F25J2270/02 (EP,US);
F25J2270/04 (EP,US);
F25J2270/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOHLENMONOXID DURCH KRYOGENE DESTILLATION | [2006/30] | English: | METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING CARBON MONOXIDE BY CRYOGENIC DISTILLATION | [2006/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION DE MONOXYDE DE CARBONE PAR DISTILLATION CRYOGENIQUE | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 28.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2004 | AT | 01.05.2013 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | IT | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | NL | 01.05.2013 | PL | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | TR | 01.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | GB | 21.09.2013 | IE | 21.09.2013 | LU | 21.09.2013 | BE | 30.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
TR | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 21.09.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 21.09.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 21.09.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 21.09.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
BE | 30.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
IE | 21.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
NL | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
IT | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
PL | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.05.2013 | |
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 02.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0933330 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure . *; | [DA]EP0928936 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [DA] 1-8 * figure 3 *; | [A]US5609040 (BILLY JEAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE19541339 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4478621 (FABIAN RAINER [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * |