Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1725628

EP1725628 - FLUORINATED ALKENE REFRIGERANT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2012/22]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
Former [2006/48]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THOMAS, Raymond, H.
5990 Hopi Court
Pendelton, NY 14094 / US
02 / SINGH, Rajiv, R.
18 Foxfire Drive
Getzville, NY 14068 / US
 [2006/48]
Representative(s)Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/22]Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2010/22]Hucker, Charlotte Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2009/52]Clarke, Lionel Paul
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2009/44]Clarke, Lionel Paul
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2006/48]Hucker, Charlotte Jane
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date04817445.225.10.2004
[2006/48]
WO2004US35132
Priority number, dateUS2003069521227.10.2003         Original published format: US 695212
[2006/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005042663
Date:12.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1725628
Date:29.11.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005
[2006/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1725628
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:C09K5/04, C10M171/00
[2006/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/17]
Former [2006/48]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:KÜHLMITTEL AUF BASIS VON FLUORIERTEM ALKEN[2006/48]
English:FLUORINATED ALKENE REFRIGERANT COMPOSITIONS[2006/48]
French:COMPOSITION DE LIQUIDES D'ALCENE FLUORE[2006/48]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2006National basic fee paid 
25.04.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.04.2006Examination requested  [2006/48]
26.05.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2009Observations by third parties
12.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2010Observations by third parties
18.02.2011Observations by third parties
10.11.2011Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2012Fee for grant paid
26.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08011766.6  / EP2009075
EP10010520.4  / EP2277970
EP10010521.2  / EP2275509
EP10011589.8  / EP2277976
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.11.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  11.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
 02  21.09.2012  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  22.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Tostmann, Holger Carl
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
 04  25.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 05  26.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
 06  27.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/47]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  11.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
 02  21.09.2012  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  22.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Tostmann, Holger Carl
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
 04  25.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 05  26.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
 06  27.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2016/04]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  11.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
 02  21.09.2012  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  22.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Opponent's representative
LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler
Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
ALPHA-Haus
Garmischer Strasse 35
81373 München / DE
 04  25.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 05  26.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
 06  27.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2015/46]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  11.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Bandpay & Greuter
17, rue de Vaucouleurs
75011 Paris / FR
 02  21.09.2012  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
 03  22.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Opponent's representative
LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler
Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
ALPHA-Haus
Garmischer Strasse 35
81373 München / DE
 04  25.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 05  26.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
 06  27.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2015/32]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  11.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Lhoste, Catherine
ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 02  21.09.2012  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
 03  22.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Opponent's representative
LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler
Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
ALPHA-Haus
Garmischer Strasse 35
81373 München / DE
 04  25.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 05  26.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
 06  27.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/37]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  11.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Lhoste, Catherine
ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 02  21.09.2012  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
 03  22.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Berngruber, Otto
von Puttkamer - Berngruber Patentanwälte Türkenstrasse 9
80333 München / DE
 04  25.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 05  26.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
 06  27.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/20]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  11.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Lhoste, Catherine
ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 02  21.09.2012  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Baker, Colin John
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  22.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Berngruber, Otto
von Puttkamer - Berngruber Patentanwälte Türkenstrasse 9
80333 München / DE
 04  25.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 05  26.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
 06  27.02.2013  21.03.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  11.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
FR-75008 Paris / FR
 02  21.09.2012   
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Baker, Colin John
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  22.02.2013   
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Berngruber, Otto
von Puttkamer - Berngruber Patentanwälte Türkenstrasse 9
80333 München / DE
 04  25.02.2013   
Daikin Industries, Ltd.
Umeda Center Bldg. 2-4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi Kita-ku
Osaka 530-8323 / JP
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 05  26.02.2013   
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Opponent's representative
Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
 06  27.02.2013   
ACEA European Automobile Manufacturers Association
Avenue des Nerviens 85
B-1040 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Wallinger, Michael
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2012/45]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  11.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
FR-75008 Paris / FR
 02  21.09.2012   
Mexichem Amanco Holding S.A. de C.V.
Rio San Javier No. 10
Fraccionamiento Viveros del Rio
Tlalnepantla, Estado de Mexico C.P. 54060 / MX
Opponent's representative
Baker, Colin John
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2012/28]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012   
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
FR-75008 Paris / FR
19.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.01.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0702/15
23.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
12.02.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/07]
11.04.2019Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/15]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
13.06.2008Request for further processing filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
10.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
MC31.10.2012
[2015/21]
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3723318  (BUTLER A) [X] 19-23 * example 4; claim - * [Y] 1-18,24-42;
 [XY]US5714083  (TURNER DONALD E [US]) [X] 19-21,23 * claim 1 * [Y] 1-18,24-42;
 [X]EP1191080  (TURNER DONALD E [US]) [X] 19-21,23,24 * claims 1-4 *;
 [X]US6258292  (TURNER DONALD E [US]) [X] 19-21,23,24 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5053155  (MAHLER WALTER [US]) [Y] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0582451  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1167894  (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1,19 * paragraph [0019] *
ExaminationWO2004037913
 JPH04110388
 US6516837
by applicantUS4788352
 US5008028
 EP0582451
otherWO2004037913
 JPH04110388
 JPH04110388K