EP1713533 - METHOD AND/OR APPARATUS FOR PUNCTURING A SURFACE FOR EXTRACTION, IN SITU ANALYSIS, AND/OR SUBSTANCE DELIVERY USING MICRONEEDLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland California 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKERJEE, Erik, V. 237 Westvale Court San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Rosemary, L. 56 Fox Hollow Bangor, ME 04401 / US | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | Thiel, Christian Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 04820779.9 | 22.11.2004 | [2006/43] | WO2004US41351 | Priority number, date | US20030524296P | 21.11.2003 Original published format: US 524296 P | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005060621 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1713533 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M37/00 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B81C1/00111 (EP,US);
A61B5/14514 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150282 (EP,US);
A61B5/150297 (EP,US);
A61B5/150343 (EP,US);
A61B5/150389 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150969 (EP,US);
A61B5/150984 (EP,US);
A61B5/15105 (EP,US);
A61B5/15142 (EP,US);
A61M37/0015 (EP,US);
A61M2037/003 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0053 (EP,US);
B81B2201/055 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/43] | A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND/ODER VORRICHTUNG ZUR PUNKTIERUNG EINER FLÄCHE ZUR EXTRAKTION, IN-SITU-ANALYSE UND/ODER SUBSTANZZUFUHR UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MIKRONADELN | [2006/43] | English: | METHOD AND/OR APPARATUS FOR PUNCTURING A SURFACE FOR EXTRACTION, IN SITU ANALYSIS, AND/OR SUBSTANCE DELIVERY USING MICRONEEDLES | [2006/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PERFORER UNE SURFACE AFIN D'EXTRAIRE, D'ANALYSER ET/OU D'ADMINISTRER UNE SUBSTANCE, AU MOYEN DE MICRO-AIGUILLES | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/39] | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2013 | 30.11.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0149362 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [Y] 14 * abstract *; | [A]WO0215960 (CLEVELAND CLINIC FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 19-37* the whole document *; | [Y]WO02062202 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [Y] 19-37 * abstract * * figures 8A-8L * * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 18, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]US2002133129 (ARIAS FRANCISCO [US], et al) [Y] 16,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0057] , [0058] , [0088] , [0117] *; | [Y]US2002155737 (ROY SHUVO [US], et al) [Y] 18 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] *; | [A]US2003015807 (MONTEMAGNO CARLO D [US], et al) [A] 19-37 * abstract * * figure 7 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] *; | [A]WO03015860 (BONSENS AB [SE], et al) [A] 19-37 * abstract * * figures 3a-3h * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 29 *; | [Y]US6533949 (YESHURUN YEHOSHUA [IL], et al) [Y] 19-37 * abstract * * figures 2A-2F * * column 5, line 31 - column 7, line 20 *; | [XY]US6558361 (YESHURUN YEHOSHUA [IL]) [X] 1-13,15,38-44 [Y] 14,16-18 | International search | [X]US6558361 (YESHURUN YEHOSHUA [IL]) |