blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1604674 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1604674



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 956
11.05.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.04.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 32
27.04.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
27.04.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 1
02.03.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.03.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
02.03.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 5
22.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
21.12.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
20.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.12.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.12.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.11.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
03.11.2017 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
03.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
27.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.10.2017 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
27.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.10.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 2
06.10.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
27.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.09.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
17.08.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
15.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.08.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.08.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
08.08.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
08.08.2017 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.08.2017 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
04.08.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.02.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.01.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
05.01.2017 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
05.01.2017 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
05.01.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
23.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.12.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
02.02.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 1
06.02.2014 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
06.02.2014 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
03.02.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
21.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
21.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
21.10.2013 Claims Appeal 1
21.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
19.08.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
19.08.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
12.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.08.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 2
12.07.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
12.07.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
13.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.06.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 3
11.04.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.04.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
06.03.2013 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
09.01.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.01.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.11.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
21.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.11.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 12
11.07.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.07.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.07.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.07.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.07.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
06.07.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
06.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.07.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.07.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
06.07.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
10.05.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.05.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.05.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.05.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
05.03.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
05.03.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
05.03.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
05.03.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.01.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
16.12.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
08.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.10.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
14.10.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.10.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
14.10.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
03.10.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.09.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
05.09.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
31.08.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.08.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.08.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
31.08.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.08.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.08.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.08.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.08.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
02.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.07.2011 Annex Opposition 1
28.07.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
26.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.02.2011 Annex Opposition 2
03.02.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.02.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.02.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.02.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.02.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.02.2011 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.02.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
27.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.10.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
21.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
10.04.2010 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
10.04.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
01.04.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.04.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
01.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.04.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
22.03.2010 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
16.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
10.03.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
10.03.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
25.09.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
25.09.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.09.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.08.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 5
18.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
18.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.08.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
18.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.10.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.09.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Opposition 2
09.09.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.09.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
09.09.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
12.08.2008 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
12.08.2008 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
11.08.2008 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
16.07.2008 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 1
16.07.2008 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 13
16.07.2008 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
16.07.2008 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 7
16.07.2008 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
29.04.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
29.04.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
29.04.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.04.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 123
25.06.2007 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
06.06.2007 Claims Search / examination 1
06.06.2007 Description Search / examination 19
06.06.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.03.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
17.01.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.12.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.10.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.05.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.12.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.11.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.11.2005 European search report Search / examination 4
03.11.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.10.2005 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
08.06.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee (divisional application) Search / examination 1
04.05.2005 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
21.04.2005 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
05.04.2005 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.03.2005 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
04.02.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.02.2005 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 3
04.02.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
02.02.2005 Invitation to pay the shortfall after fee increase Search / examination 1
02.02.2005 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
04.01.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
04.01.2005 Description Search / examination 108
04.01.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2005 Drawings Search / examination 19
04.01.2005 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 9
04.01.2005 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 8
23.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 108
28.05.1999 Sequence listing Search / examination 1