|
14.10.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.10.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Description |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.06.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
58 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
58 |
|
14.04.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2006 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2005 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2005 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |