EP1563794 - Surgical stapling apparatus with locking mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states TYCO HEALTHCARE GROUP LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marczyk, Stanislaw 113 A Riverbend Road Stratford, CT 06614 / US | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003450.3 | 17.02.2005 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | US20040545621P | 17.02.2004 Original published format: US 545621 P | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563794 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1563794 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2006/19] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Klammernahtgerät mit Verriegelungsmechanismus | [2005/33] | English: | Surgical stapling apparatus with locking mechanism | [2005/33] | French: | Agrafeuse chirurgicale avec mécanisme de verrouillage | [2005/33] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5584425 (SAVAGE ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 8 * * column 17, line 9 - column 19, line 50 ** figures 40-53 *; | [A]US5820009 (MELLING HUGH [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 35 * * column 14, line 3 - column 15, line 3 * * figures 24,30-36 *; | [DA]US6241139 (MILLIMAN KEITH L [US], et al) [DA] 1,11 * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 59 * * figures 31-34,40-44 * |