EP1600748 - Radar-based level gauge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krohne S.A. Usine des Ors, B.P. 98 26103 Romans - Cedex / FR | [2016/15] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Krohne S.A. Usine des Ors, B.P. 98 26103 Romans - Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bletz, Achim 4 rue du Chalon 26260 Clérieux / FR | 02 /
Musch, Thomas, Dr. Franziskusstrasse 12 44795 Bochum / DE | [2016/15] |
Former [2005/48] | 01 /
Bletz, Achim 4rue du Chalon 26260 Clérieux / FR | ||
02 /
Musch, Thomas, Dr. Franziskusstrasse 12 44795 Bochum / DE | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Gesthuysen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05003958.5 | 24.02.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | DE20041026560 | 26.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004026560 | [2005/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1600748 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1600748 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/284, H01P1/203 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Radar-Füllstandsmessgerät | [2005/48] | English: | Radar-based level gauge | [2005/48] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de niveau par radar | [2015/47] |
Former [2005/48] | dispositif de mesure de niveau par radar | Examination procedure | 26.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2005 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | IS | 13.08.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 24.02.2005 | |
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.02.2005 | |
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 24.02.2005 | |
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.02.2005 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9428592 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 8, line 3 - page 10, line 6; figures 2a-3d *; | [A]EP1069679 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, lines 3-11 * * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 19 * * column 5, lines 6-29 * * column 7, line 7 - column 8, line 10 ** figure 1 *; | [YD]US2004066588 (FLASZA MICHAEL D [US], et al) [YD] 1-9 * the whole document * |